Global patent index - EP 0664583 B1

EP 0664583 B1 2000-01-26 - Small incandescent lamp holder

Title (en)

Small incandescent lamp holder

Title (de)

Fassung für Kleinglühlampe

Title (fr)

Douille pour petite lampe à incandescence

Publication

EP 0664583 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94117807 A

Priority

DE 4401487 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0664583A1] A small electric light bulb (10) is mounted into a holder (7) that fits into an aperture formed in a circuit board (PCB) (1). The PCB has a hole formed with an essentially circular cross- section and with two oppositely positioned slots that allow locking arms to be inserted. The main body (9) of the holder has a pair of arms (13) with tip sections (15) that latch into position. Contact arms (12) engage tracks on the PCB.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/09; F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/09 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/042 (2013.01); F21V 19/001 (2013.01); H01R 33/09 (2013.01); H01R 33/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0664583 A1 19950726; EP 0664583 B1 20000126; AT 189349 T 20000215; DE 4401487 A1 19950803; DE 4401487 C2 19970814; ES 2142900 T3 20000501; PT 664583 E 20000428; US 5545058 A 19960813

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20021213

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Document Number: 94117807.1

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

2002-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SLI MINIATURE LIGHTING G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-11-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-11-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011111

2001-11-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011111

2001-09-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-09-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2001-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001124

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001123

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001117

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001116

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-11-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001110

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142900

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189349

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SLI MINIATURE LIGHTING GMBH & CO. KG

1999-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALBRECHT, PAUL

1996-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960614

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951208

1995-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR GB IE IT NL PT SE