Global Patent Index - EP 0664976 B1

EP 0664976 B1 2000-04-19 - Package for stick-form products, especially cosmetic or pharmaceutic products and process for assembling this package

Title (en)

Package for stick-form products, especially cosmetic or pharmaceutic products and process for assembling this package

Title (de)

Behälter für stiftförmige Produkte, insbesondere kosmetische oder pharmazeutische Produkte und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Etui pour bâton de produits, notamment cosmétiques ou pharmaceutiques et procédé d'assemblage de cet étui

Publication

EP 0664976 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400202 A

Priority

FR 9401089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0664976A1] Applicator for cosmetic or pharmaceutical prods. consists of a hollow elongated housing (1), closed at one end and open at the other, and contg. a holder (4) for the stick prod. (6) in the shape of a socket (5) on the end of a strip. The strip is made from a flexible material and its edges are able to slide in grooves (26) along the inside of the housing which pass round curves (30) at the back and extend beneath an elongated port (18) in the housing's upper wall. Part of the surface of the strip has a series of projections (46) which form a grip for the thumb, allowing the stick to be extended from the housing or retracted by sliding the strip along the grooves. The far end of the strip covers the open end of the housing when the stick is fully retracted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0664976 A1 19950802; EP 0664976 B1 20000419; AT 191831 T 20000515; DE 69516319 D1 20000525; DE 69516319 T2 20010104; ES 2147596 T3 20000916; FR 2715543 A1 19950804; FR 2715543 B1 19960419; US 5568989 A 19961029

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-11-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516319

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120801

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-10-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120928

2012-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191831 T

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110131

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080301

2005-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147596 T3

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-08-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LABORATOIRE ONYLIGNE

2000-07-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516319 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191831 T 20000515

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE COMMERCIAL DE PRODUITS DE SANTE - SCPS

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BENGUIGUI, DANIEL ROBERT

1998-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980721

1996-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960201

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI