Global Patent Index - EP 0664982 A3

EP 0664982 A3 2000-09-06 - Fitting

Title (en)

Fitting

Title (de)

Beschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure

Publication

EP 0664982 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 94120259 A

Priority

AT 7794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0664982A2] The mounting has a holder unit (10) pref. screwed in place for each carrier section (7) to secure the rear wall (11) to the tenons (27). The holder (10) has a mounting member parallel to the rear wall, to be attached to it. A housing section (15) has side wall openings, to be engaged by the tenons. The carrier is of plastics and the holder is of steel plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/941 (2017.01); A47B 88/931 (2017.01); A47B 88/938 (2017.01); A47B 2088/902 (2017.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0664982 A2 19950802; EP 0664982 A3 20000906; EP 0664982 B1 20030219; AT 232690 T 20030315; CA 2140210 A1 19950718; CA 2140210 C 20010327; DE 59410245 D1 20030327; ES 2188603 T3 20030701; JP 3013639 U 19950718; US 5588730 A 19961231

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 232690

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141221

2014-12-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59410245

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59410245

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2003-08-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2188603

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59410245

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-03-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2002-08-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FITTING FOR FIXING A REAR WALL OF A DRAWER TO DRAWER COMPONENTS

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020211

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT