Global Patent Index - EP 0665064 B1

EP 0665064 B1 2000-05-24 - Unidirectional rotating vibrator

Title (en)

Unidirectional rotating vibrator

Title (de)

Unidirektionaler Rotationsvibrator

Title (fr)

Vibrateur rotatif unidirectionnel

Publication

EP 0665064 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94630004 A

Priority

  • EP 94630004 A
  • FR 9209210 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2693926A1] The vibrator comprises a flange (14) with a central bearing (26) supporting a drive shaft (27) carrying an unbalanced weight (30).The same drive shaft also turns a second, coaxial unbalanced weight (36) through reversible and non-reversible transmission mechanisms (50, 51) linked by a return shaft (39) set in a bearing (38) in the flange (14), with the two mechanisms operating without slip. The non-reversible mechanism incorporates a toothed gear (41) connected to the return shaft (69), and a second gear (37) which is centred without contact on the drive shaft (27) through a bearing (34), the two gears being connected by a toothed belt (42).The reversible transmission comprises a pinion (32) which is fixed to the motor shaft (27) meshing with a second one (40) on the return shaft (39), forming a self-lubricating transmission. The drive for shaft (27) can be electrical, pneumatic or hydraulic. ADVANTAGE - Produces unidirectional sinusoidal vibration from a single lightweight unit of small dimensions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2693926 A1 19940128; FR 2693926 B1 19950811; EP 0665064 A1 19950802; EP 0665064 B1 20000524

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050127

2003-09-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-07-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020718

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: UFFICIO BREVETTI RICCARDI & C.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424642 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

1998-03-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980130

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960127

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL