Global Patent Index - EP 0665104 B2

EP 0665104 B2 2000-05-03 - Method and device for printing one sheet after the other

Title (en)

Method and device for printing one sheet after the other

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Nacheinander Bedrucken von Bogen

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation pour l'impression feuille à feuille

Publication

EP 0665104 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 94490057 A

Priority

FR 9400093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0665104A1] The printing involves passing the sheet to be printed between facing cylinders. The sheet is carried on a print cylinder (2) that has a rubber layer (3) on its outer surface. A pressure cylinder (6) presses the sheet onto the rubber surface. The ink is applied by another cylinder (5) facing the print cylinder. To reduce deformation of the sheet the ratios of the linear peripheral speeds of ink cylinder (5) and pressure cylinder (6) to the linear peripheral speed of the print drum, are controlled. The ratios are always greater than one, and lie in the range 1.004 to 1.05. The ratios are set in response to the deformation of the surface of the rubber on the print cylinder, and with a view to minimising the electrical power consumption of the print cylinder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/004 (2013.01); B41F 31/00 (2013.01); B41P 2213/734 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • FR 2553032 A1 19850412 - GRACE W R LTD [US]
  • Report of the proceedings fourteenth annual meeting and technical forum, Flexographic Technical Asssociation, Chicago, Ill., US, April 5-6, 1972, pp 1-22 and 43-151
  • UGRA Mitteilungen, 3/76 Dezember 1976, Seiten 59-88

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2714632 A1 19950707; FR 2714632 B1 19960315; CN 1062811 C 20010307; CN 1125174 A 19960626; DE 69400403 D1 19960926; DE 69400403 T2 19970213; DE 69400403 T3 20010315; EP 0665104 A1 19950802; EP 0665104 B1 19960821; EP 0665104 B2 20000503; ES 2093504 T3 19961216; ES 2093504 T5 20001016; US 5542353 A 19960806

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131219

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131220

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-12-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69400403

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131219

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131219

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CUIR (S.A.)

- Free text: CUIR (S.A.)#14, RUE DU PONT DE GRES#F-62220 CARVIN (FR) -TRANSFER TO- CUIR (S.A.)#14, RUE DU PONT DE GRES#F-62220 CARVIN (FR)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-11 [REG DE 8570] REINSTATEMENT OF THE FORMER POSITION

2000-10-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2000-06-07 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2000-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2000-05-03 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

1997-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Effective date: 19970829

1997-06-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BOBST SA

- Effective date: 19970430

1996-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093504 T3

1996-11-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

1996-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69400403 19960926

1996-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

1996-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1996-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951228

1995-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950526

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI