Global Patent Index - EP 0665337 B1

EP 0665337 B1 2000-07-19 - Method for fitting a grouted anchor for anchoring revetment walls, buildings, bank protection works, quay walls and the like

Title (en)

Method for fitting a grouted anchor for anchoring revetment walls, buildings, bank protection works, quay walls and the like

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einbringung eines Injektionsankers, unter anderem für Verkleidungsmauern, Gebäude, Uferbekleidungen, Kaimauern, etc.

Title (fr)

Méthode d'installation d'un ancrage injecté, notamment pour murs de revêtement, bâtiments, protections des berges, murs de quais, etc.

Publication

EP 0665337 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95200183 A

Priority

NL 9400121 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0665337A1] The procedure for fitting a grouted anchor for anchoring revetment walls, buildings, bank protection works, quay walls and the like is as follows: a solid or hollow anchor rod (1) made of high-grade steel is introduced into the ground, via a cavity in the anchor rod, a pipe fitted around the rod and/or one or more small tubes (5) which are fixed to the outside of the rod, liquid is fed into the hole around the rod while the rod is introduced into the ground, grout is fed via said rod cavity, pipe and/or small tubes (5) as soon as the lower end of the rod has reached the desired level from the top of the grout body, grout is introduced under a pressure of at least 15 bar into the ground via said rod cavity, pipe and/or small tubes, the lower end of the rod is brought to the desired depth while the grout is fed in under high pressure and the grout is allowed to set. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 5/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/80 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0665337 A1 19950802; EP 0665337 B1 20000719; DE 69518020 D1 20000824; NL 9400121 A 19950901

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020126

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-26 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518020 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-07-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

1999-09-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR FITTING A GROUTED ANCHOR FOR ANCHORING REVETMENT WALLS, BUILDINGS, BANK PROTECTION WORKS, QUAY WALLS AND THE LIKE

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980213

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960117

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL