Global Patent Index - EP 0665373 B1

EP 0665373 B1 2000-05-10 - Fuel injection pump

Title (en)

Fuel injection pump

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 0665373 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94120704 A

Priority

  • JP 34917093 A
  • JP 34917693 A
  • JP 34918193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0665373A1] A fuel injection pump comprising a plunger (15) and a plunger barrel formed with a main port (41) and a sub-port (42) whose upper edge (42A) is no higher than the upper edge (42A) of the sub-port (42), the plunger head is provided with an upper sub-lead groove (47) capable of communicating with the sub-port (42) and of maintaining communication therewith even when the main port (41) is closed by an upper end (15A) of the plunger (15), with a lower sub-lead groove (48) capable of communicating with the sub-port (42) and with an inclined lower main lead groove (44) capable of communicating with the main port (41). In a second aspect of the invention, the plunger (15) is further formed with an upper main lead groove (46) and a positional relationship is established such that in the rotational position of the plunger (15) at engine starting the main port (41) can be closed by a portion of the upper end (15A) of the plunger (15) not formed with the upper main lead groove (46) and the sub-port (42) can be closed by a portion of the upper end (5A) of the plunger (15) not formed with the upper sub-lead groove (47). These configurations enable both utilization of preflow effect and control of the start and cutoff of fuel injection. In a third aspect of the invention, the fuel injection pump is used in combination with a throttling type fuel injection nozzle provided in an auxiliary combustion chamber of a divided-chamber combustion system diesel engine in order to control fuel injection cutoff and reduce maximum fuel injection rate during low-speed, high-load operation thereby reducing generation of black smoke and particulate. During high-load operation the main port (41) does not communicate with the lower main lead groove (44) even when the sub-port (42) communicates with the lower sub-lead groove (48) and during low-load operation the sub-port (42) does not communicate with the lower sub-lead groove (48) even when the main port (41) communicates with the lower main lead groove (44). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/26 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/265 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0665373 A1 19950802; EP 0665373 B1 20000510; DE 69424400 D1 20000615; DE 69424400 T2 20000831; KR 960010290 B1 19960727

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011227

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011227

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424400 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1995-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950929

1995-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941227

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB