Global Patent Index - EP 0665560 B1

EP 0665560 B1 2000-04-05 - Hybrid integrated circuit device

Title (en)

Hybrid integrated circuit device

Title (de)

Hybridschaltungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à circuit intégré hybride

Publication

EP 0665560 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94119166 A

Priority

DE 9319473 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0665560A2] Hybrid switching arrangement has a resistance layer applied on one side of plate-like substrate made of glass or ceramic. A ceramic strip (6) is applied on one side of the substrate (1). Pref. the ceramic strip (6) is made of aluminium oxide, beryllium oxide or aluminium nitride, and is secured using heat conducting adhesive. The substrate (1) and strip (6) are both made of aluminium oxide and are both 1mm thick. The ceramic strip is at most 0.5 (pref. 0.1)mm thick.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 1/01; H01C 1/084; H01C 1/144; H01L 23/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/01 (2006.01); H01C 1/084 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 1/01 (2013.01); H01C 1/084 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 9319473 U1 19940623; AT 191581 T 20000415; EP 0665560 A2 19950802; EP 0665560 A3 19970502; EP 0665560 B1 20000405; US 5581227 A 19961203

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081205

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-01-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409274 20000511

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191581 T 20000415

1997-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970617

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1997-04-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01C 1/01

1995-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE