Global patent index - EP 0666308 B1

EP 0666308 B1 2000-08-09 - Multi-purpose liquid cleaning compositions

Title (en)

Multi-purpose liquid cleaning compositions

Title (de)

Flüssige Allzweckreinigungsmittelzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions nettoyantes liquides pour tous usages

Publication

EP 0666308 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94201634 A

Priority

  • EP 94201634 A
  • EP 94870018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0666308A2] The present invention relates to multi-purpose aqueous cleaning compositions comprising hydrogen peroxide, a 2-alkyl alkanol, a hydrophobic surfactant having an HLB below 14 and an anionic surfactant. The present invention also encompasses the use of 2-alkyl alkanols together with hydrophobic surfactants, in aqueous cleaning compositions, so as to improve the greasy cleaning of said compositions. 2-alkyl alkanols in combination with hydrophobic surfactants can be used in any composition including laundry detergents or hard surface cleaners for bathrooms or kitchens or floors.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/68 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/831 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/04 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/02 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/202 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/2017 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 17/041 (2013.01); C11D 1/02 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 4021265 A1 19920109 - KREUSSLER CHEM FAB [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0666308 A2 19950809; EP 0666308 A3 19960605; EP 0666308 B1 20000809; AU 1737895 A 19950821; AU 701779 B2 19990204; BR 9506715 A 19970909; CA 2182672 A1 19950810; CN 1144533 A 19970305; EG 20508 A 19990630; FI 963078 A0 19960802; FI 963078 A 19961001; JP H09508655 A 19970902; MX 9603201 A 19970731; WO 9521233 A1 19950810

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020101

2002-02-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010608

2002-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-06-08 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-01-05 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-10 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69425483

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-03-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981214

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960117

1995-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE