Global Patent Index - EP 0666324 B1

EP 0666324 B1 2000-04-19 - Installation for coupling a movable metallurgical vessel to a flexible gas conduit

Title (en)

Installation for coupling a movable metallurgical vessel to a flexible gas conduit

Title (de)

norrichtung zum Ankuppern eines Verfahrbaren metallurgischen Gefässes an eine flexible Gasleitung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'accouplement d'un chariot métallurgique à une conduite flexible

Publication

EP 0666324 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95100345 A

Priority

LU 88457 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0666324A1] A device is claimed for coupling a metallurgical carriage (10) with a flexible shaft (20), comprising a first half coupling (22) mounted on the metallurgical carriage (10) and a second half coupling (24) connected to one end of the flexible shaft (20). A coupling station (26) is located close to the predefined coupling position of the metallurgical carriage (10). This coupling station (26) incorporates a support block designed to receive and support the second half coupling (24), a drive mechanism for displacing the support block from a parking position in the direction of the first half-coupling (22) and vice versa. The second half-coupling (24) is fitted with a locking device that is activated by a control device on the coupling station (26). This locking device facilitates the locking, in a first position, of the second half-coupling (24) to the first half-coupling (22) and, in a second position, the second half-coupling (24) on to its support on the coupling station (26).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/46; B22D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); C21C 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/462 (2013.01); B22D 1/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0666324 A1 19950809; EP 0666324 B1 20000419; AT 191935 T 20000515; AU 1151695 A 19950810; AU 691222 B2 19980514; BR 9500530 A 19951024; CA 2140219 A1 19950803; DE 69516321 D1 20000525; DE 69516321 T2 20000907; ES 2145167 T3 20000701; LU 88457 A1 19950901; US 5520374 A 19960528; ZA 9500470 B 19950928

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020112

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PAUL WURTH

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020113

2002-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020112

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-10 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-01-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010108

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145167 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516321 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191935 T 20000515

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990319

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951207

1995-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE