Global Patent Index - EP 0666370 B1

EP 0666370 B1 2001-04-04 - Method of coating at least one side of a fibrous web with a coating medium and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method of coating at least one side of a fibrous web with a coating medium and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum wenigstens einseitigen Beschichten einer Faserstoffbahn mit einem Auftragsmedium und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour l'enduction d'au moins une face d'une bande fibreuse avec un matériau d'enduction et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0666370 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95100887 A

Priority

DE 4402627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4402627A1] To apply a coating to a fibre web, and esp. paper, the coating is applied as an initial dosing directly to an applicator roller through at least one free spray stream.Pref. the free jet stream (13) is applied directly at the mantle surface (11, 12) of the applicator roller (1, 2), or at the surface of a transfer roller which carries the coating to the applicators (1, 2). The free jet stream (13) and/or its application angle can be adjusted.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/56; B05C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/28 (2006.01); B05C 1/08 (2006.01); B05C 1/14 (2006.01); B05C 9/04 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/00 (2006.01); D21H 23/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/56 (2013.01); B05C 1/0813 (2013.01); B05C 1/0826 (2013.01); B05C 1/14 (2013.01); B05C 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 2310526 A1 19730927 - INVENTING AB

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4402627 A1 19940714; AT 200326 T 20010415; CA 2141473 A1 19950801; CA 2141473 C 20061031; EP 0666370 A1 19950809; EP 0666370 B1 20010404; FI 108848 B 20020415; FI 950408 A0 19950130; FI 950408 A 19950801; JP 3435242 B2 20030811; JP H07313914 A 19951205

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140124

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509140

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200326 T

- Effective date: 20140124

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59509140

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120124

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120124

2012-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120124

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509140 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200326 T 20010415

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

1999-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1997-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970828

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951216

1995-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT