Global Patent Index - EP 0666391 B2

EP 0666391 B2 2001-05-02 - Door lock for motor vehicle and its installation process

Title (en)

Door lock for motor vehicle and its installation process

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss und Verfahren zu Einbau eines Kraftfahrzeug-Türschlosses

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte de véhicule automobile et son procédé de montage

Publication

EP 0666391 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94110979 A

Priority

  • DE 4402507 A
  • DE 4406870 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5622396A] An automobile door lock having a lock mechanism, with a variety of levers, and lock elements, like a ratchet (1) and a pawl (2), whereby the lock mechanism has an outer actuation lever (6), cooperating with an operating surface (4) of an outer door handle (5), and a clutch lever (9), cooperating with an outer actuating lever (6). Between the levers, there is provided a bolt connection assembly (12) with a longitudinal slot (13), a retaining bolt (14), and a bias spring (15). With the retaining bolt (14) loosened, the outer actuating lever (6) is moved by means of the bias spring (15), until it contacts the operating surface (4). With retaining bolt (14) tightened, both levers are firmly connected to form a unit which is adjustable by the outer door handle (5). With the automobile door lock not installed, the outer actuation lever (6) is in, or near, an end delivery position opposing the force of the bias spring (15), relative to clutch lever (9), and the retaining bolt (14) is strongly tightened such that the bias spring (15) is not effective. With the automobile door lock installed, the retaining bolt (14) is loosened, so that bias spring (15) is effective, and the outer actuation lever (6) is shifted in the direction towards operating surface (4) of outer door handle (5), up to the point of its contact therewith, forming its operational position. With the outer actuation lever (6) in this position, the retaining bolt (14) is tightened such that both levers (6, 9) are firmly interconnected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 1/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 65/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/36 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1083 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5622396 A 19970422; EP 0666391 A1 19950809; EP 0666391 B1 19970226; EP 0666391 B2 20010502; ES 2098828 T3 19970501; ES 2098828 T5 20010901

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59401859

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59401859

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080715

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080714

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080714

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-07-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030715

2002-07-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-06-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-08-01 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-06 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE

1997-12-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KIEKERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19971029

1997-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19970505

1997-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970501

1997-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2098828 T3

1997-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Free text: CORRECTIONS

1997-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59401859 19970403

1997-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE

1996-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

1996-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960416

1995-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950531

1995-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB PT SE