Global Patent Index - EP 0666783 B1

EP 0666783 B1 2000-04-12 - PARTICULATE FEEDSTOCK FOR METAL INJECTION MOLDING

Title (en)

PARTICULATE FEEDSTOCK FOR METAL INJECTION MOLDING

Title (de)

PULVERMISCHUNG ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN VON METALL

Title (fr)

MATERIAU PARTICULAIRE D'ALIMENTATION POUR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION

Publication

EP 0666783 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93918800 A

Priority

  • AU 9300454 W
  • AU PL463692 A
  • AU PL968093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9406586A1] Particles of metal alloys and composites have been developed that are particularly suitable for use in producing thixotropic alloys and in the injection molding of such alloys. The particulate material comprises particles of metal alloy or composite, wherein a substantial proportion of the particles is shaped such that the ratio of the length of the largest dimension of a particle to the effective diameter of the particle is in the range of 1.0 to 4.0 and the substantial proportion of particles has a particle size wherein the largest dimension of the particles lies within the range of 0.5 to 5.0 mm. This allows convenient handling of the particles whilst also avoiding binding or clogging of the screw, in the case where a screw extruder is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 23/00; B22D 17/00; C22B 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 17/20 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/02 (2006.01); B22F 3/22 (2006.01); C22B 9/16 (2006.01); C22C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/225 (2013.01); B22D 17/007 (2013.01); B22F 1/0007 (2013.01); B22F 1/0011 (2013.01); C22B 9/16 (2013.01); C22C 1/005 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/225

Citation (examination)

  • DE 3639737 A1 19880601 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • US 3881913 A 19750506 - EMELYANOV IVAN YAKOVLEVICH, et al
  • GB 2182063 A 19870507 - MITSUBISHI METAL CORP
  • US 4460407 A 19840717 - KEITH EARL K [US]
  • Look-up Table Mesh/Microns
  • Design Engineering Feb. 1989, page 33
  • Hoechst Data Sheet "Karbid und Metallurgische Produkte", Sept. 1978
  • Brochure of Reade Manufacturing Company
  • Brochure of Reynolds Metals Company
  • Analysis of Eckart Granules of 12.12.2000
  • PFEIFER H.: "Grundlagen der Fordertechnik" 1989
  • MENGES G.: "Einführung in der Kunststoffverarbeitung" 1986
  • "Granulierung der thermoplastischen Kunststoffen" VDI-Verlag GmbH 1974
  • JOHANNABER F.: "Kunststoffmaschinenführer" 1992
  • Brochure from Poudmet
  • ERICKSON S.: Proceedings 44th Annual World Magnesium Conference, Tokyo, 1987
  • "Thixomolding" Proceedings 47th Annual World Magnesium Conference, Cannes, France, 1990
  • KURIHARA K. et al: Japanese language article, pages 255-260, April 1981 and English translation thereof
  • GHOSH D. et al: Proceedings on the International Symposium on Advances in Production and Fabrication of Light Metals and Metal Matrix Composites, Alberta, August 23-27, 1992
  • PASTERNAK D. et al: Proceedings of the Second International Conference of the Semi-Solid Processing of Alloys and Composites, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Cambridge, Massachusetts, 1993
  • PASTERNAK D. et al: Proceedings of the Second International Conference of Semi-Solid Processing of Alloys and Composites, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, June 10-12, 1992

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9406586 A1 19940331; BR 9307038 A 19990824; CA 2144434 A1 19940331; DE 69328374 D1 20000518; DE 69328374 T2 20000810; DE 69333841 D1 20050818; EP 0666783 A1 19950816; EP 0666783 A4 19970702; EP 0666783 B1 20000412; EP 0666783 B2 20060315; EP 0960673 A1 19991201; EP 0960673 B1 20050713; IL 106986 A 19970814; IL 106986 D0 19931228; JP 3497167 B2 20040216; JP H08501128 A 19960206; MX 9305588 A 19940531

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060906

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060906

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060616

2006-03-15 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060315

2006-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-08-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050809

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-09-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2003-09-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030909

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-06-05 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MANNESMANN PLASTICS MACHINERY AG * 20010111 CHUO-K

- Effective date: 20010111

2002-05-29 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MANNESMANN PLASTICS MACHINERY AG * 20010111 CHUO-K

- Effective date: 20010111

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MANNESMANN PLASTICS MACHINERY AG

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NORSK HYDRO A.S.

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHUO-KOSAN CO. LTD.

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-07-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328374 20000518

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THIXOMAT, INC.

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971202

1997-07-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19970514

1997-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1995-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950308

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE