Global Patent Index - EP 0667210 B1

EP 0667210 B1 2000-04-19 - Polishing head, particularly for slabs of marble, granite, porcelainized gres, and other stone materials

Title (en)

Polishing head, particularly for slabs of marble, granite, porcelainized gres, and other stone materials

Title (de)

Polierkopf, insbesondere für Marmorplatten, Granit, Keramik, und anderes Gestein

Title (fr)

Tête de polissage, en particulier pour plaques de marbre, granit, céramique, et autres matériaux pierreux

Publication

EP 0667210 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95100598 A

Priority

IT VI940017 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0667210A1] A polishing head for marble, granite, porcelainized gres, and other stone materials, includes a main shaft (3) which is rotatably mounted on a stationary support (4) and is coupled to an external motor. A casing (2) which is keyed to the lower end of the main shaft (3) and a series of secondary shafts (5) which are arranged within the casing (2) and have external ends provided with abrasive tools (8). The head includes a cam-based movement means (13, 13'; 16, 16') which is connected to the secondary shafts (7) and a transmission means (18, 20) which is interposed between the stationary support (4) and the movement means (13, 13'; 16, 16') and is constituted by at least one worm screw/helical gear coupling (18, 20) wherein the worm screw (18) is fixed to the stationary support (4) and the helical gear is rotatably mounted on the casing (2). The cam-based movement means includes at least one intermediate shaft (14) on which a first cam (13) is keyed. The first cam (13) is suitable to cooperate with a roller which is mounted at the end of a radial arm (17) that is rigidly coupled to one of the secondary shafts (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 41/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/0475 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0667210 A1 19950816; EP 0667210 B1 20000419; DE 69516324 D1 20000525; ES 2147581 T3 20000916; IT 1267682 B1 19970207; IT VI940017 A1 19950810; IT VI940017 D0 19940209

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-01-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147581 T3

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-07-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516324 20000525

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL PT

2000-04-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981005

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960203

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL PT