Global patent index - EP 0667559 B1

EP 0667559 B1 2000-06-07 - Solid processing composition for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive materials

Title (en)

Solid processing composition for silver halide color photographic light-sensitive materials

Title (de)

Feste Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von lichtempfindlichen farbphotographischen Silberhalogenidmaterialien

Title (fr)

Composition solide pour le traitement des matériaux d'halogénure d'argent photosensibles pour la photographie en couleurs

Publication

EP 0667559 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95101760 A

Priority

  • JP 1857194 A
  • JP 2127894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0667559A1] A solid processing composition for a silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material is disclosed, the composition comprising an amino polycarboxylic acid ferric complex hydrate, wherein the drying weight reduction at 50 DEG C of the composition is 0.1 to 10.0 % by weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/265 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

  • W.A.Ritschel, Die Tablette, 1966, p. 231 to 234
  • Hackh's Chemical Dictionary, 4th Ed., 1972, page 329

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0667559 A1 19950816; EP 0667559 B1 20000607; DE 69517346 D1 20000713; DE 69517346 T2 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050203

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-10-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010210

2000-11-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517346

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-06-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981229

1995-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950503

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL