Global patent index - EP 0667580 B1

EP 0667580 B1 2000-09-06 - Cache System for a memory

Title (en)

Cache System for a memory

Title (de)

Cache-Speicheranordnung für einen Speicher

Title (fr)

Système d'antémémoire pour une mémoire

Publication

EP 0667580 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95300681 A

Priority

US 19604294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0667580A2] A cache system buffers data stored in a main memory (11) and utilized by a processor (12). The cache system includes a first cache (23), a second cache (14), first transfer means (26,10), second transfer means (25,26,10), third transfer means, and an access means. The first cache (23) is fully associative. The second cache (14) is directly mapped. The first transfer means (26,10) transfers data lines from the main memory (11) to the first cache (23). The second transfer means (25,26,10) transfers data lines from the first cache (23) to the second cache (14). The third transfer means transfers data lines from the second cache (14) to the main memory (11). Accesses of data lines from the first cache (21) and the second cache (14) are performed in parallel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/08 (2006.01); G06F 12/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/0897 (2013.01); G06F 12/0864 (2013.01); G06F 12/12 (2013.01); G06F 12/0862 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0667580 A2 19950816; EP 0667580 A3 19960731; EP 0667580 B1 20000906; DE 69518676 D1 20001012; DE 69518676 T2 20010104; JP 3618385 B2 20050209; JP H07253926 A 19951003; US 5603004 A 19970211

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518676

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518676

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-10-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-05-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518676

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971229

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB