Global Patent Index - EP 0667630 B1

EP 0667630 B1 2001-04-04 - Switch device for rotatable support for contact carrier

Title (en)

Switch device for rotatable support for contact carrier

Title (de)

Schalteinrichtung mit drehbarem Tragkörper für Kontaktträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif interrupteur à support rotatif pour porte-contact

Publication

EP 0667630 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95101246 A

Priority

DE 9400146 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0667630A1] The switch unit has a rotatable carrier body (1) with rotary bearing (3). A contact carrier (4) is carried on the carrier body (1) eccentrically to its rotary bearing (3), and is rotatable relative to the carrier body (1). The contact carrier (4) has some play in the direction of the contact axis (9). The contact carrier (4) lies with two contact members (7) at the fixed counter-contacts (9) of the fixed counter contact carrier (8), by a spring. The spring direction and the return (11) of the carrier body (1) are dimensioned such that a vertical component from the freely adjustable circular path (12) of the movable contact (7) goes along a flat arc segment (13) such that in this movement range, the contacts (7) make a translatory relative movement to the fixed counter contacts (9). The movable contacts (7), at the end of the spring stroke, allow a quick lifting or even a reverse run.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/18; H01H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2006.01); H01H 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/18 (2013.01); H01H 1/20 (2013.01); H01H 1/2041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0667630 A1 19950816; EP 0667630 B1 20010404; AT 200364 T 20010415; DE 59509141 D1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59509141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130930

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2003-01-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021219

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509141

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200364

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000817

1996-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960119

1995-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT