Global Patent Index - EP 0667918 B1

EP 0667918 B1 2000-02-16 - NON-RADIOACTIVE HYBRIDIZATION ASSAY AND KIT

Title (en)

NON-RADIOACTIVE HYBRIDIZATION ASSAY AND KIT

Title (de)

NICHT-RADIOAKTIVES HYBRIDISATIONS TESTVERFAHREN UND SATZ

Title (fr)

KIT ET DOSAGE UTILISANT HYBRIDISATION NON RADIOACTIVE

Publication

EP 0667918 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 92924354 A

Priority

  • US 9209604 W
  • US 79258591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9310263A1] A non-radioactive hybridization assay and kit for the detection of genetic defects, microbial infections or viral infections, such as human papillomavirus. A test sample is treated with a base and incubated with nucleic acid probes, diluted in a neutralizing buffer, specific for target nucleic acids. The hybrids are captured onto a solid phase coated with an anti-hybrid antibody, unhybridized probe is eliminated, and the bound hybrid detected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C12Q 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12Q 1/70 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/706 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6813 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6816 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6865 (2013.01); C12Q 1/689 (2013.01); C12Q 1/708 (2013.01); C12Q 2525/301 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12Q 1/6813 + C12Q 2525/131
  2. C12Q 1/6816 + C12Q 2563/131 + C12Q 2565/50

Citation (examination)

  • US 4965188 A 19901023 - MULLIS KARY B [US], et al
  • US 4968602 A 19901106 - DATTAGUPTA NANIBHUSHAN [US]
  • ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 186, pages 369-373 (1990)
  • CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 23, pages 261-266 (1990)
  • CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 23, pages 267-277 (1990)
  • BIOCHEMICAL AND ORGANIC COMPOUNDS FOR RESEARCH AND DIAGNOSTIC CLINICAL REAGENTS, page 261 (1986)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9310263 A1 19930527; AT 189831 T 20000315; AU 3068992 A 19930615; AU 673813 B2 19961128; DE 69230693 D1 20000323; DE 69230693 T2 20000615; DK 0667918 T3 20000605; EP 0667918 A1 19950823; EP 0667918 B1 20000216; ES 2145750 T3 20000716; FI 112095 B 20031031; FI 942239 A0 19940513; FI 942239 A 19940706; GR 3033345 T3 20000929; JP 3091492 B2 20000925; JP H07505759 A 19950629; US 2002012936 A1 20020131; US 6228578 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121112

2013-08-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-07-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130705

2013-02-06 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA

- Ref Document Number: 20000401030

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20121113

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20121111

2013-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 189831

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-12-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20121111

2012-11-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *DIGENE DIAGNOSTICS INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BE20

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-11-21 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20121112

2012-11-19 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

2012-11-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69230693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111205

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-12 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145750

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69230693

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-23

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189831

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960913

1995-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940530

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL SE