Global patent index - EP 0667946 B1

EP 0667946 B1 2000-04-26 - AN ARRANGEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR LARGE SPACES

Title (en)

AN ARRANGEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR LARGE SPACES

Title (de)

EINE ANORDNUNG IN VERBINDUNG MIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE FÜR GROSSE RÄUME

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ASSOCIE A UN ENSEMBLE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR DE GRANDS ESPACES

Publication

EP 0667946 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93924635 A

Priority

  • FI 9300471 W
  • FI 925105 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9411678A1] The invention relates to an arrangement in connection with an air conditioning unit, comprising at least one fan (4) fitted within a casing structure, means for conveying untreated outdoor and indoor air into the casing structure, and distributor means (9) for distributing air into the interior space of the building to be air conditioned. To improve the overall economy of the air conditioning unit, the arrangement is constructed as a wall-mounted unit and the distributor means (9, 19) for distributing air into the interior space are integrated in the same unit with the other components of the arrangement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00; E04C 2/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/52 (2006.01); F24F 1/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/523 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0033 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9411678 A1 19940526; AT 192227 T 20000515; AU 5422894 A 19940608; DE 69328491 D1 20000531; DE 69328491 T2 20001109; EP 0667946 A1 19950823; EP 0667946 B1 20000426; FI 925105 A0 19921110; FI 925105 A 19940511; FI 97166 B 19960715; FI 97166 C 19971230; PT 667946 E 20000831

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051110

2006-07-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060510

2005-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051111

2005-11-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-11-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051110

2004-11-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041015

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-08-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000512

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192227

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB FLAEKT OY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970130

1995-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950509

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT PT SE