Global Patent Index - EP 0668027 A3

EP 0668027 A3 2000-10-11 - Method and device for the handling of containers receiving trays with cigarettes

Title (en)

Method and device for the handling of containers receiving trays with cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Handhabung von Zigarettenschragen aufnehmenden Containern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la manipulation de conteneurs recevant des récipients avec des cigarettes

Publication

EP 0668027 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 95101188 A

Priority

DE 4404902 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0668027A2] The container (2) comprises two box stations with box exchange. After box transfer from a container to the top box station, the container is lowered to the plane of the lower box station and re-supplied with cigarette boxes. The empty container lowering takes place directly from an end position, reached by an intermittent or cyclic horizontal feed. To the lowering motion may be linked an intermittent, horizontal, resetting stroke movement of the container for the cigarette box reception. The forward and rearward stroke motions may take place during the box transfer w.r.t. two vertically aligned transfer positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/352

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/352 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/352 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4404902 A1 19950817; DE 4404902 C2 20020411; AT 216845 T 20020515; CN 1053332 C 20000614; CN 1113423 A 19951220; EP 0668027 A2 19950823; EP 0668027 A3 20001011; EP 0668027 B1 20020502; ES 2173931 T3 20021101; JP 3599401 B2 20041208; JP H07308181 A 19951128; US 5553988 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100128

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100801

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100128

2010-08-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100801

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050129

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050129

2004-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030204

2003-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2173931 T3

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510185 20020606

2002-05-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 216845 T 20020515

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE