Global Patent Index - EP 0668028 B1

EP 0668028 B1 2000-07-19 - Device for receiving cigarette trays

Title (en)

Device for receiving cigarette trays

Title (de)

Aufnahmeeinrichtung für Zigarettenschragen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la réception de récipients à cigarettes

Publication

EP 0668028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95101450 A

Priority

DE 4404901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0668028A1] The casing has a transport unit container (3) with several retention cells (13) for the cigarette etc. boxes (2). Each cell pref. forms an air-tight storage chamber for the cigarettes etc. with the side-open cigarette box. The cells are formed by the container partitions (12). The container is enclosed by a top wall (4), a rear wall (8), and two side walls (7), with a front-open insert side (11) and an open bottom side (9). The latter may be fitted with insert strips (14). Each cell opposite partition is typically fitted with a transverse aligning strip, protruding into the cell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/358; A24C 5/352

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/352 (2006.01); A24C 5/358 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/352 (2013.01); A24C 5/358 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4404901 A1 19950817; AT 194757 T 20000815; CN 1098658 C 20030115; CN 1119083 A 19960327; EP 0668028 A1 19950823; EP 0668028 B1 20000719; ES 2149284 T3 20001101; JP 3681427 B2 20050810; JP H07313133 A 19951205; US 5597219 A 19970128

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130203

2013-12-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508577

- Effective date: 20130903

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-02-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149284 T3

2000-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508577 20000824

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194757 T 20000815

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1998-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980706

1996-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960126

1995-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE