Global Patent Index - EP 0668228 B1

EP 0668228 B1 2000-08-02 - Installation for producing a web splice

Title (en)

Installation for producing a web splice

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Herstellen einer Bahnverbindung

Title (fr)

Installation pour établir un raccordement de bandes

Publication

EP 0668228 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94120633 A

Priority

DE 4401963 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4401963A1] The blade (11) first, and then the splice element (2), are brought into an operating position so that the length of material is held taut on the splice element (2). The length is pulled from the splice element on to the blade cutting edge for cutting it. The splice element, in the form of a tube or girder, has a suction zone (4) and pivots on support arms (3) on an axis parallel to the drum axis. The support arms are mounted on the stand (12) holding the first deflector roller (5). USE/ADVANTAGE - The rigid, small dia. lightweight splice element consists of a cylindrical tube part of whose outer casing is held by a suction zone, and enables the cutting blade to be easily replaced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18; B65H 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/18 (2006.01); B65H 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/1847 (2013.01); B65H 19/20 (2013.01); B65H 2406/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4401963 A1 19940609; DE 4401963 C2 19980903; AT 195110 T 20000815; CA 2140998 A1 19950726; CA 2140998 C 20010703; EP 0668228 A2 19950823; EP 0668228 A3 19960925; EP 0668228 B1 20000802; FI 950185 A0 19950116; FI 950185 A 19950726; JP H07291492 A 19951107; US 5740982 A 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-01-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011224

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-12-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-11-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409468 20000907

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195110 T 20000815

1999-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1998-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980827

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970204

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE