Global patent index - EP 0668536 B1

EP 0668536 B1 2000-03-22 - Solid developing tablet for silver halide photographic light-sensitive materials and its use

Title (en)

Solid developing tablet for silver halide photographic light-sensitive materials and its use

Title (de)

Feste Entwicklungszusammensetzung in Tablettenform für lichtempfindliche photographische Silberhalogenidmaterialien und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Composition développante solide sous forme de comprimé pour matériaux photographiques à l'halogénure d'argent sensibles à la lumière et son utilisation

Publication

EP 0668536 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95100588 A

Priority

  • JP 2218494 A
  • JP 4203094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0668536A1] A solid developing composition for a silver halide photographic light-sensitive material is disclosed, the composition containing an alkali agent and a developing agent and at least a part of the composition being in the form of granules, wherein the composition has a specific volume of 0.6 to 2.0 cm<3>/g and a moisture content of 0.1 to 15% by weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/413; G03C 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 5/305 (2006.01); G03C 7/413 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0668536 A1 19950823; EP 0668536 B1 20000322; DE 69515713 D1 20000427; DE 69515713 T2 20000727; JP H07248585 A 19950926

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2005-01-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-09-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010118

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515713

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1996-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960719

1995-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950503

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL