Global Patent Index - EP 0668538 B1

EP 0668538 B1 2000-04-26 - Device for replenishing solid processing agent used in a light-sensitive material processing apparatus

Title (en)

Device for replenishing solid processing agent used in a light-sensitive material processing apparatus

Title (de)

Gerät zur Nachfüllung von festem Entwicklungswirkstoff in einem Gerät zur Behandlung von Lichtempfindlichem Material

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le remplissage d'agent solide de traitement utilisé dans un appareil pour le traitement de matériel photosensible

Publication

EP 0668538 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95102101 A

Priority

JP 1955294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0668538A1] In an apparatus for supplying a solid processing agent (J) to a processing tank (1) of a photographic material processing apparatus, there is provide a put-back mechanism for putting a solid processing agent (J) back into an accommodation container (33) when the accommodation container (33) is moved from a operating position to a maintenance position on which the accommodation container (33) can be replaced with a new one. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03D 3/06 (2006.01); G03D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0668538 A1 19950823; EP 0668538 B1 20000426; DE 69516437 D1 20000531; DE 69516437 T2 20001123; JP H07230154 A 19950829

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-02-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030215

2002-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516437 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-11-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990713

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960221

1995-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB