Global Patent Index - EP 0669701 B1

EP 0669701 B1 2001-05-16 - Gate power supply circuit

Title (en)

Gate power supply circuit

Title (de)

Speisespannungsschaltung für Gatesteuerstufe

Title (fr)

Circuit d'alimentation de l'étage de commande de gâchette

Publication

EP 0669701 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94301321 A

Priority

  • EP 94301321 A
  • CA 2116394 A
  • US 20068594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0669701A1] A gate power supply circuit including a switching device and a gate drive circuit connected to the switching device for generating a gate signal to be supplied to a gate of the switching device. The gate power supply circuit further includes a first series circuit of a first capacitor and an inductor, connected in parallel with the switching device, and a second series circuit of a first diode and a second capacitor, connected in parallel with the inductor. The gate drive circuit is connected to the second capacitor to receive energy stored in the second capacitor as power source for the gate drive circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02M 1/088; H02M 1/096

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 1/08 (2006.01); H02M 1/096 (2006.01); H03K 17/0814 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H03K 17/08144 (2013.01); H02M 1/08 (2013.01); H02M 1/096 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0654885 A1 19950524 - GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0669701 A1 19950830; EP 0669701 B1 20010516; CA 2116394 A1 19950825; CA 2116394 C 19970701; US 5450308 A 19950912

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140225

2014-04-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69427221

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-02-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427221 20010621

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

1996-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960905

1995-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940304

1995-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE