Global Patent Index - EP 0669859 B1

EP 0669859 B1 2000-04-19 - BAR INTRODUCTION DEVICE

Title (en)

BAR INTRODUCTION DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINFÜHREN VON STÄBEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE MISE EN PLACE DE BARRES

Publication

EP 0669859 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94925437 A

Priority

  • EP 9402617 W
  • IT UD930170 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9506531A1] The invention is concerned with a mechanical device suitable for introduction and positioning of metal bars or rods or metal profiles of any section and length used preferably on machines for the production of electrowelded normal or special meshs, shaped according to drawing, through particular flanked double chained means of transport (4) having the purpose to feed and position a plurality of bars (1) at the same time on the collecting surface (9). Said couples of chains (4), parallel and vertical, at closed run, are moved by toothed wheels (6) of large curving ray and by others of smaller ray (5.1 - 5.2). Each chain carries on the outside a plurality of teeth or slabs with lateral semicircle gap, all directed in the same sense: therefore in a single couple of chains, one chain will have slabs (7) in one direction while the other flanked chain has the opposite (8) in order to form a plurality of housings suitable to receive, transport and place bars (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 23/00; B21D 43/00; B65G 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/00 (2006.01); B21F 23/00 (2006.01); B21F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/10 (2013.01); B21D 43/006 (2013.01); B21F 23/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9506531 A1 19950309; AT 178235 T 19990415; AT 191869 T 20000515; AU 7535194 A 19950322; DE 69417539 D1 19990506; DE 69417539 T2 19991007; DE 69424034 D1 20000525; DE 69424034 T2 20000914; EP 0669859 A1 19950906; EP 0669859 B1 20000419; IT 1262187 B 19960619; IT UD930170 A1 19950228; IT UD930170 D0 19930830

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-09-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 191869 T

- Effective date: 20140806

2014-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-08-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424034

2014-08-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424034

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130813

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69424034

- Representative's name: SCHIEBER - FARAGO, DE

2011-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69424034

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER, KINKELDEY, STOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUS, DE

2011-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69424034

- Representative's name: GRUENECKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTG MB, DE

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424034 20000525

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191869 T 20000515

1997-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970128

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950905

1995-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI