Global Patent Index - EP 0670139 B1

EP 0670139 B1 2000-11-02 - Floor-sweeping machine

Title (en)

Floor-sweeping machine

Title (de)

Kehrmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à balayer

Publication

EP 0670139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95102964 A

Priority

DE 4407091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0670139A2] The sweeping machine has at least one roller delivering the sweepings into a catchment receptacle and surrounded by a housing. For pushing the machine, a grip stirrup is provided which extends upwards, at an angle, to the operator. The grip stirrup (5), in the section plane area of the upper and rear edge of the housing (4a,4b), has two lateral pivot bearings (6) for folding up the grip stirrup. The bearings are formed as support points in the upright storage position of the sweeping machine. The pivot bearings for inclination adjustment of the grip stirrup have a securing device with several securing positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4038 (2013.01); A47L 11/22 (2013.01); A47L 11/4041 (2013.01); A47L 11/4061 (2013.01); A47L 11/4075 (2013.01); A47L 11/4091 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4407091 C1 19950831; AT 197236 T 20001115; EP 0670139 A2 19950906; EP 0670139 A3 19960417; EP 0670139 B1 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-03-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-03-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-02-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508814

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-07

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197236

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990415

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT

1995-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR GB IT