Global patent index - EP 0670186 B1

EP 0670186 B1 2000-03-01 - Liquid spraying vessel

Title (en)

Liquid spraying vessel

Title (de)

Flüssigkeits-Sprühbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient pulvérisateur de liquide

Publication

EP 0670186 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95105752 A

Priority

  • EP 95105752 A
  • EP 90917693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0670186A2] A liquid spraying vessel provided with a body proper (1), a cylinder (10) suspended in the vessel with cap-like member (3) fitted over the outer periphery of opening neck of the vessel, and a stem (17) erecting from a cylindrical piston (16) fitted into said cylinder and passing through the top wall (4) of said cap-like member, and a working piece (20) having a head (18) with a nozzle to open toward the front side fitted at the upper end of said stem, so that liquid in the vessel is sucked into the cylinder with the vertical movement of the working piece relative to the cylinder and spouted from the nozzle (19) through the stem, wherein said working piece is easily operated with auxiliary walls (6, 6) to serve as finger-applying parts and head guides are erected on both sides of the head of the working piece. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00; B65D 47/06; B65D 47/34; B65D 83/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3052 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0670186 A2 19950906; EP 0670186 A3 19950920; EP 0670186 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051204

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2005-12-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051204

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-12-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-12-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041201

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-09-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO. LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69033474

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2000-03-01 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 513350

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1996-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960919

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1995-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950517

1995-09-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 513350

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1995-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL