Global patent index - EP 0670391 B1

EP 0670391 B1 2000-02-09 - A compact multi-use mobile work tool

Title (en)

A compact multi-use mobile work tool

Title (de)

Bewegliches, kompaktes Vielzweck-Arbeitsgerät

Title (fr)

Outil de travail mobile, compact et polyvalent

Publication

EP 0670391 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95830070 A

Priority

IT MO940031 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0670391A1] The invention relates to a compact multiuse mobile work tool, comprising a frame (1) and provided with wheels (2), whereon a rotatable platform (3) is hinged about a vertical axis. On the rotatable platform (3) are arranged: a motor (4), housed posteriorly, and a cockpit (5) for an operator, by a side of which is located, in a decentralized position, an articulated manoeuvring arm (6), composed of a first segment (7) and a second segment (8), reciprocally hinged. The second segment (8) bears at a free end thereof, a rapid universal attachment (9) for tools or equipment, while the first segment (7) thereof is hinged to the rotatable platform (3) by means of a pivot (17) and is activated to rotate about the pivot (17) by a hydraulic lever system comprising a connecting member (12) and a lever (11) commanded by a hydraulic cylinder (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/30 (2006.01); E02F 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/32 (2013.01); E02F 3/307 (2013.01); E02F 3/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0670391 A1 19950906; EP 0670391 B1 20000209; DE 69514945 D1 20000316; DE 69514945 T2 20000817; ES 2143027 T3 20000501; IT 1268911 B1 19970313; IT MO940031 A1 19950905; IT MO940031 D0 19940304

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100304

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100303

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090226

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143027

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MANITOU COSTRUZIONI INDUSTRIALI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514945

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980406

1996-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960130

1995-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT