Global Patent Index - EP 0670887 B2

EP 0670887 B2 2000-12-27 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES

Publication

EP 0670887 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93924768 A

Priority

  • GB 9302345 W
  • GB 9224014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9411487A1] A particulate detergent composition having a bulk density of at least 600 g/l comprises a surfactant system comprising a nonionic surfactant, at least one detergency builder and optionally other detergent ingredients, wherein the nonionic surfactant comprises a condensation product of ethylene oxide with an aliphatic alcohol having an average alkyl chain length of less than C12 and an average degree of ethoxylation not exceeding 8, and the surfactant system is free of ethoxylated nonionic surfactants having an average chain length of C12 or above and an average degree of ethoxylation below 7. The use of short-chain nonionic surfactant improves delivery of the composition to the wash in an automatic washing machine, and also gives detergency benefits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 1/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • EP 0367339 A2 19900509 - UNILEVER NV [NL], et al
  • US 4206070 A 19800603 - JONES KENNETH L [US]
  • US 4399049 A 19830816 - GRAY IAN [GB], et al
  • "Dobanol" Technical Bulletin UD/104, 1988, by Shell Chemicals
  • "Surface Active Ethylene Oxide Adducts" by N. Schönfeldt, Pergamon Press, 1969, pp. 141,366,367
  • Kirk-Othmer Encyclopedia of Chem. Technology, vol. 22, 3rd ed., 1983, p. 363

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9411487 A1 19940526; AU 5431294 A 19940608; AU 689449 B2 19980402; BR 9307457 A 19990831; CZ 284655 B6 19990113; CZ 9501051 A3 19951115; DE 69316917 D1 19980312; DE 69316917 T2 19980528; DE 69316917 T3 20010329; EP 0670887 A1 19950913; EP 0670887 B1 19980204; EP 0670887 B2 20001227; ES 2112437 T3 19980401; ES 2112437 T5 20010216; GB 9224014 D0 19930106; HU 217238 B 19991228; HU T72620 A 19960528; IN 179513 B 19971011; JP 2776985 B2 19980716; JP H08503240 A 19960409; PL 174609 B1 19980831; PL 308363 A1 19950724; SK 280568 B6 20000313; SK 63995 A3 19960403; ZA 9308507 B 19950515

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111116

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-06-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130603

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69316917

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101202

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-02-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-12-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

- Effective date: 19981030

1998-08-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

1998-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1998-05-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980504

1998-04-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2112437 T3

1998-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

1998-03-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69316917 19980312

1998-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-02-04 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980204

1998-02-04 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980204

1998-02-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980204

1996-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960607

1995-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950318

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE