Global Patent Index - EP 0670921 B1

EP 0670921 B1 2001-04-04 - WARP AND WEFT FABRIC BASED ON PREDOMINANTLY UNTWISTED MULTIFILAMENT YARN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

WARP AND WEFT FABRIC BASED ON PREDOMINANTLY UNTWISTED MULTIFILAMENT YARN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

GEWEBE MIT KETTE UND SCHUSS AUF BASIS VON TECHNISCHEN MULTIFILAMENTEN GARNEN HAUPTSÄCHLICH OHNE TORSION UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

TISSU CHAINE ET TRAME A BASE DE FILS TECHNIQUES MULTIFILAMENTS A PREDOMINANCE SANS TORSION ET PROCEDE D'OBTENTION

Publication

EP 0670921 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94900890 A

Priority

  • FR 9301175 W
  • FR 9214399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2007169873A] <P>PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To provide a textile structure intended for a composite material, which has little fine pores even using threads with a high yarn count and allows sufficient penetration of resin. <P>SOLUTION: The fabric composed of multifilament threads is characterized in that at least 80% of the weight of the constituent warp and weft satisfies the followings: (a) the yarn count to be used for a fabric weight per unit area is greater than the conventional case; (b) the thread has a torsion not greater than the original torsion; and (c) the width is greater than or equal to an original width before weaving over the entire length. When the weight ratio of weft to warp is 80/20, the threads having the above characteristics constitute all threads in a direction composed of the larger parts by weight of the threads, and when the ratio is smaller than 80/20, these threads constitute all threads of the fabric. The fiber volume ratio is approximately constant throughout the fabric and is greater than the fiber volume ratio of conventional fabric to use thread having smaller yarn count as a base material. <P>COPYRIGHT: (C)2007,JPO&INPIT

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 15/00; D03D 3/00; D06C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 15/02 (2006.01); B29C 70/10 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 3/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/00 (2006.01); D03J 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 15/0088 (2013.01); D03D 3/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/00 (2013.01); D03J 1/06 (2013.01); D10B 2101/06 (2013.01); D10B 2101/08 (2013.01); D10B 2101/12 (2013.01); D10B 2321/021 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01); D10B 2505/00 (2013.01); Y10S 428/902 (2013.01); Y10T 428/30 (2013.01); Y10T 442/20 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2984 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2992 (2015.04); Y10T 442/30 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3065 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3472 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2698640 A1 19940603; FR 2698640 B1 19950217; AT 200312 T 20010415; AU 5567494 A 19940622; AU 673872 B2 19961128; CA 2150468 A1 19940609; CA 2150468 C 20080722; DE 69330100 D1 20010510; DE 69330100 T2 20011115; EP 0670921 A1 19950913; EP 0670921 B1 20010404; ES 2155469 T3 20010516; JP 2007169873 A 20070705; JP 3954090 B2 20070808; JP H08503747 A 19960423; US 5732748 A 19980331; US 5939338 A 19990817; WO 9412708 A1 19940609

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131129

2014-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 200312 T

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-12-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20131129

2013-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-11 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-12-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69330100

2013-11-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: S.A. *HEXCEL REINFORCEMENTS

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121110

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121117

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-12-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-12-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: HEXCEL REINFORCEMENTS

2005-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: HEXCEL REINFORCEMENTS

- Free text: HEXCEL FABRICS#3, AVENUE CONDORCET#69100 VILLEURBANNE (FR) -TRANSFER TO- HEXCEL REINFORCEMENTS#3, AVENUE CONDORCET#69100 VILLEURBANNE (FR)

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TENAX FIBERS GMBH & CO.KG

2002-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TENAX FIBERS GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20011222

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155469 T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69330100 20010510

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200312 T 20010415

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEXCEL FABRICS

1995-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951106

1995-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950504

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES GB GR IT LI NL SE