Global Patent Index - EP 0671511 B1

EP 0671511 B1 2000-01-26 - Swing type excavator

Title (en)

Swing type excavator

Title (de)

Schwenkbagger

Title (fr)

Pelle du type pivotant

Publication

EP 0671511 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95103250 A

Priority

  • JP 3606294 A
  • JP 3606394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671511A2] In a swing type excavator, a swing post 13 is attached to an upper structure 11, which is able to turn within a width of an undercarriage 10, at a position forwardly and laterally of a cab 12. A front attachment 1, including a bucket 22, an arm 19, an upper boom 17, a lower boom 14 and a cross link 15, is mounted to the swing post 13. The cross link 15 intersects a line connecting a coupling point between the upper boom 17 and the lower boom 14 and a coupling point between the lower boom 14 and the swing post 13, and changes an opening angle between the upper boom 17 and the lower boom 14 depending on a vertical tilt angle of the lower boom 14. With this arrangement, the upper structure including the front attachment can be turned within the undercarriage width by a simple construction with no need of using a complex link mechanism, and interference between the front attachment and the cab can be easily avoided when the front attachment is swung. Also, a horizontal pin 31 as the coupling point between boom 14 and the swing post 13 is positioned rearwardly of a swing pin 30 as the swing center of the swing post 13 away from the front attachment. With this arrangement, the so-called ultra-small or undercarriage-width turn is realized without reducing both the side ditch distance in a side ditch digging condition and the maximum digging depth in a deep digging posture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/30; E02F 3/32; E02F 3/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/30 (2006.01); E02F 3/32 (2006.01); E02F 3/38 (2006.01); E02F 9/20 (2006.01); E02F 3/34 (2006.01); E02F 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/32 (2013.01); E02F 3/301 (2013.01); E02F 3/302 (2013.01); E02F 3/325 (2013.01); E02F 3/384 (2013.01); E02F 9/2033 (2013.01); E02F 3/307 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671511 A2 19950913; EP 0671511 A3 19960214; EP 0671511 B1 20000126; DE 69514699 D1 20000302; DE 69514699 T2 20000531; DE 69533115 D1 20040708; DE 69533115 T2 20040930; EP 0900886 A2 19990310; EP 0900886 A3 20010131; EP 0900886 B1 20040602

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050307

2002-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-10-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-03-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20000530

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-04-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000414

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514699 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

1999-12-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980507

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960115

1996-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL