Global Patent Index - EP 0671632 B1

EP 0671632 B1 2001-12-12 - Field winding ground fault detector and relay

Title (en)

Field winding ground fault detector and relay

Title (de)

Erdschlussdetektor und Schutzrelais für Erregerwicklungen

Title (fr)

Détecteur de court-circuit à la masse et relais de protection pour un enroulement d'excitation

Publication

EP 0671632 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95301146 A

Priority

JP 2858094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671632A2] According to a field ground fault detector, a predetermined resistor is connected in series to a predetermined DC voltage. A DC voltage is applied between an N electrode side field circuit of a generator and a ground through the resistor. A voltage applied between terminals of the resistor is input to a low-pass filter. A voltage applied between the N electrode side field circuit and the ground is input to another low-pass filter. Output voltages of the low-pass filters are input to a level ratio determining circuit. The level ratio determining circuit outputs the determined result of the ground fault to the outside of the field ground fault detector corresponding to these voltages. Thus, even if the DC voltage varies or a higher harmonic voltage takes place in a generator of a thyristor exciting type, it does not affect the detecting sensitivity of the ground fault. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 31/06; G01R 31/34; H02H 3/17; H02H 7/06; H02K 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02H 7/06 (2006.01); G01R 31/06 (2006.01); H02H 3/17 (2006.01); H02P 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02H 7/065 (2013.01); G01R 31/346 (2013.01); G01R 31/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671632 A2 19950913; EP 0671632 A3 19960918; EP 0671632 B1 20011212; CA 2143364 A1 19950826; CA 2143364 C 20011127; CN 1045821 C 19991020; CN 1112682 A 19951129; DE 69524463 D1 20020124; DE 69524463 T2 20020718; JP 3468817 B2 20031117; JP H07241027 A 19950912; KR 100206027 B1 19990701; US 5675465 A 19971007; US 5764462 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050223

2004-03-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-02-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69524463 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000714

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1995-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950314

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE