Global Patent Index - EP 0671641 B1

EP 0671641 B1 2001-12-12 - Multilayer coating

Title (en)

Multilayer coating

Title (de)

Mehrlagige Beschichtung

Title (fr)

Revêtement à multicouches

Publication

EP 0671641 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94114891 A

Priority

DE 4407502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671641A2] The material is of good permeability to visible light, providing a high degree of light transmission and definite colour coordinates. A first layer of silicon alloy is deposited on the material and incorporates Mg, A1,Zr,Ti or TA amounting to less than 15 atomic percent. This is followed in turn by a first thin layer of silver; second and third ones, consisting respectively of Ti, Zr, In, or alloys of them NiCr alloy; and a second one of the silicon alloy above; a second thicker layer of silver; a thin part-oxide layer the same as the second one above; and a third metal-oxide layer the same as the silicon one.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 5/20; C03C 17/36; G02B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/28 (2006.01); G02B 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 5/208 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12611 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24975 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31678 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671641 A2 19950913; EP 0671641 A3 19970423; EP 0671641 B1 20011212; DE 4407502 A1 19950914; JP 3949182 B2 20070725; JP H07281022 A 19951027; US 5591529 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130921

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59410009

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130921

2014-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *APPLIED FILMS G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020308

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59410009 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APPLIED FILMS GMBH & CO. KG

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991001

1997-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970510

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1996-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BALZERS UND LEYBOLD DEUTSCHLAND HOLDING AKTIENGESE

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL