Global Patent Index - EP 0671655 B1

EP 0671655 B1 2000-06-21 - Improved hardening of hydrophylic colloids with imidazolium and triazine combinations

Title (en)

Improved hardening of hydrophylic colloids with imidazolium and triazine combinations

Title (de)

Verbesserte Härtung hydrophiler Kolloide mit Imidazolium/Triazinkombinationen

Title (fr)

Durcissement amélioré de colloids hydrophyliques à l'aide de combinaisons imidazolium/triazine

Publication

EP 0671655 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95103145 A

Priority

US 20877894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671655A2] An improved method of hardening a hydrophilic colloid is detailed. The hardening results in a stronger matrix and less water pickup. These and other advantages are obtained by hardening with a combination of at least one hardener chosen from Formula I and at least one hardener chosen from Formula II: <CHEM> The substituents are defined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671655 A2 19950913; EP 0671655 A3 19960228; EP 0671655 B1 20000621; DE 69517541 D1 20000727; DE 69517541 T2 20010208; JP H07325363 A 19951212

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020101

2001-12-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010306

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517541 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.

1997-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STERLING DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING, INC.

1996-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961007

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960813

1996-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT