Global Patent Index - EP 0671658 B8

EP 0671658 B8 2002-12-11 - Exposure apparatus and reflection type mask to be used in the same

Title (en)

Exposure apparatus and reflection type mask to be used in the same

Title (de)

Belichtungsgerät sowie dazu gehörende Reflexionsmaske

Title (fr)

Appareil d'exposition ainsi que masque à réflexion

Publication

EP 0671658 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 95301087 A

Priority

JP 3171294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671658A2] A reflection type mask includes a reflective portion having a multilayered film, a non-reflective portion having an absorbing material and being formed on the multilayered film, and a non-reflective portion being defined by destroying the multilayered film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03F 1/14; G03F 1/00; G03F 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 1/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/20 (2006.01); G03F 9/00 (2006.01); G21K 1/06 (2006.01); H01L 21/027 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); B82Y 40/00 (2013.01); G03F 1/24 (2013.01); G03F 1/72 (2013.01); G03F 7/20 (2013.01); G03F 7/70283 (2013.01); G03F 9/70 (2013.01); G21K 1/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671658 A2 19950913; EP 0671658 A3 19960313; EP 0671658 B1 20020612; EP 0671658 B8 20021211; JP H07240364 A 19950912; US 5549994 A 19960827

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2014-09-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140901

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100221

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100221

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-20 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: WATANABE, YUTAKA, C/O CANON K.K. * HAYASHIDA, MASAMI, C/O CANON K.K.

2002-09-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980403

1996-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960724

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB NL