Global Patent Index - EP 0671787 B1

EP 0671787 B1 2000-06-07 - Device for connecting shielded conductors in telephone and datacommunication

Title (en)

Device for connecting shielded conductors in telephone and datacommunication

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anschluss abgeschirmter Leiter in der Telefonie und Datenkommunikation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la connexion de conducteurs blindés dans la téléphonie et communication de données

Publication

EP 0671787 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95102754 A

Priority

CH 71594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671787A2] The device provides a connector for screened leads in telephony and data communications. It includes a metallic earthing plate (1) which can be supported on a printed circuit board or the like. The earthing plate (1) has a first bent back tongue. This forms a contact mandrel (2) into which is plugged a screened lead or cable, between its screening and the cable cladding. The plate (1) also has a second tongue, spaced from the contact mandrel (2), and running essentially parallel to it. This tongue forms a recess (3) into which the cable is laid. The recess (3) can be bent by setting using a cable tie (8), opposite the contact mandrel (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646; H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/50 (2013.01); H01R 9/0515 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01); H01R 2201/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671787 A2 19950913; EP 0671787 A3 19961218; EP 0671787 B1 20000607; AU 1368995 A 19950921; AU 680987 B2 19970814; CH 690531 A5 20000929; DE 59508439 D1 20000713; JP 3434073 B2 20030804; JP H0845615 A 19960216; PL 176096 B1 19990430; PL 307605 A1 19950918; TW 271506 B 19960301; US 5657385 A 19970812

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060227

2005-03-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050227

2005-02-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-02-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508439 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/646 A, 7H 01R 9/05 B

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971010

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970612

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT