Global Patent Index - EP 0671866 B1

EP 0671866 B1 2001-04-18 - Circuit for operating a discharge lampe; its use and an associated process

Title (en)

Circuit for operating a discharge lampe; its use and an associated process

Title (de)

Stromversorgungsschaltung für eine Entladungslampe, deren Verwendung und Verfahren zum Betrieb

Title (fr)

Circuit d'alimentation d'une lampe à décharge; son utilisation ainsi qu'un procédé associé

Publication

EP 0671866 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94118802 A

Priority

DE 4407674 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0671866A2] A DC power supply for a gas discharge lamp has a current-limiting device and an ignition device. The latter is in parallel with the electrodes and contains a semiconducting switch (14). It is in series with an ignition voltage generator (12) and a ballast resistor (13). There is a condenser (17) across the output of the generator. The switch is an optical coupler and its control inputs (20, 21) are connected to an ignition pulse generator. The lamp is filled with hydrogen or deuterium. After the start of the heating phase, the glow cathode is subject to the ignition voltage, there being a small overlap between heating and ignition phases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/18 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0671866 A2 19950913; EP 0671866 A3 19961204; EP 0671866 B1 20010418; DE 4407674 A1 19950914; US 5530319 A 19960625

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141129

2014-12-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20141129

2014-12-10 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20141130

2014-12-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-06-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409733

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981005

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1995-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941207

1995-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL