Global patent index - EP 0672369 B1

EP 0672369 B1 2000-08-16 - Covering of glass panes for furniture and the like

Title (en)

Covering of glass panes for furniture and the like

Title (de)

Glasabdeckung für Möbel od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Recouvrement de vitres pour meubles et similaires

Publication

EP 0672369 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95890022 A

Priority

AT 42994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0672369A2] The glass cover (1) for furniture or similar comprises a glass plate (2) inserted in a plastics frame (3) which has side arms (4) which engage the plate and grip and/or retention part (6). The plastics frame is injection moulded directly onto the glass plate. In the area of the grip and/or retention parts, the side arms are connected via at least a cross brace (9) formed through a hole (8) in the glass plate. The side arms of the plastics frame form widened fixture lobes (7), which are provided with the grip and/or retention parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 95/04; A47B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 95/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0672369 A2 19950920; EP 0672369 A3 19980128; EP 0672369 B1 20000816; AT 400713 B 19960325; AT A42994 A 19950715; DE 59508632 D1 20000921; DK 0672369 T3 20001218; ES 2150542 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150201

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-04-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150424

2015-02-25 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150130

2015-02-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-02 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20150131

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-04-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: AHT COOLING SYSTEMS GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-04-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AHT COOLING SYSTEMS GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120326

2011-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: AHT COOLING SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20110420

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AHT COOLING SYSTEMS GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59508632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110208

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150542

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001009

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508632

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980326

1998-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT