Global patent index - EP 0672449 B1

EP 0672449 B1 2000-09-06 - Method and device for preparing a slurry, emulsioning or/and grinding

Title (en)

Method and device for preparing a slurry, emulsioning or/and grinding

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aufschlämmen, Emulgieren und/oder Mahlen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour délayage, émulsification et/ou broyage

Publication

EP 0672449 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810119 A

Priority

CH 79094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0672449A1] A process and assembly (A, B) grinds and converts substances into sludge or emulsions. The starting substances consist of solid particles, solid particles and a fluid, solid particles and several immiscible fluids, or several normally immiscible fluids. The twin assembly (A, B) incorporates a grinding point (MS) at which the substances are ground in a converging gap between two surface areas (MA, MB) rotating about axes (X, Y). The novelty is that the substances being processed are brought to the grinding point (MS) and the necessary pressure forces are generated, by the surfaces (MA, MB) as they move together from the same side to the grinding point (MS). The two grinding surfaces (MA, MB) pass through the grinding point (MS) at different rotational speeds. The forces deforming the substances are generated in the vicinity of the grinding point (MS) by a combination of opposing concave and convex surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0672449 A1 19950920; EP 0672449 B1 20000906; AT 196103 T 20000915; CH 688026 A5 19970430; DE 59508694 D1 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 196103

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20150222

2015-02-27 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-02-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508694

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140116

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-06-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130301

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040222

2004-02-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040222

2003-02-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CERES HEILMITTEL A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-13 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-04-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508694

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 196103

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980505

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980505

1996-05-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960301

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE