Global Patent Index - EP 0673443 B2

EP 0673443 B2 2001-01-10 - METHOD OF ANNEALING STEEL STRIP IN AN ANNEALING FURNACE WITHOUT THE FORMATION OF SOOT

Title (en)

METHOD OF ANNEALING STEEL STRIP IN AN ANNEALING FURNACE WITHOUT THE FORMATION OF SOOT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM RUSSFREIEN GLÜHEN VON STAHLBAND IN EINEM GLÜHOFEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RECUIT SANS FORMATION DE SUIE DE FEUILLARDS D'ACIER DANS UN FOUR A RECUIT

Publication

EP 0673443 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94901900 A

Priority

  • DE 4241746 A
  • EP 9303334 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9413843A1] When annealing steel strip in annealing furnaces, contamination often occurs in the form of carbon deposits on the surface of the steel. The use of hydrogen in the protective-gas atmosphere allows such deposits to be converted to methane. If, however, a thermodynamically determined methane-concentration limit is exceeded, soot deposits are formed. In order to avoid this, methane formed as a reaction product is removed at intervals from the dome of the furnace in a protective-gas purge cycle. The invention calls for the purge cycle to depend on the amount of CH4 formed and to be controlled by a system which measures the fixed thermodynamic values of the H2/CH4 system and compares them with permitted limits. If the measured values are above or below the respective limits, an additional purge is carried out during the hold time for a period of approximately 1 hour. This ensures optimum purging and improved product quality at reduced annealing cost.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/67; C21D 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/76 (2006.01); C21D 9/67 (2006.01); C21D 9/52 (2006.01); C21D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/67 (2013.01); C21D 1/76 (2013.01); C21D 9/52 (2013.01); C21D 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • DE 3931195 A1 19900329 - BANDSTAHLKOMBINAT MATERN VEB [DD]
  • DE 3631551 C1 19871119 - MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH
  • "Die Schmierung beim Kaltwalzen und das Glühen von Kaltband unter Wasserstoff - insbesondere im Hinblick auf die Bandsauberkeit", Verein Deutscher Eisenhüttenleute, Fachausschussbericht 4032, Düsseldorf, Oktober 1990, S. 185-197
  • W.A. Beugeling: "Improved Performance of Batch Annealing at Hoogovens Ijmuiden, by Applying 100% Hydrogen as Process Atmosphere", S. 1-9 vorgetragen am Internationalen Kongress HICON/H2, 20-22 Mai, 1992 in Linz (AT)
  • Lehrbuch "Grundlagen der allgemeinen und anorganischen Chemie",H.R. Christen, 3. Aufl. 1971, S. 177, 206-211
  • B.J. Hewitt: "The New Quality achieved with HICON/H2 Bell Annealer", S.1-17, vorgetragen am Internationalem Kongress HICON/H2, 20.-22. Mai 1992 in Linz (AU), S. 1-18

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT LU

EPO simple patent family

WO 9413843 A1 19940623; AT 149575 T 19970315; DE 4241746 C1 19940825; EP 0673443 A1 19950927; EP 0673443 B1 19970305; EP 0673443 B2 20010110; HR P931483 B1 19980630; SI 9300652 A 19940630; SI 9300652 B 20020228; US 5645655 A 19970708; ZA 9309267 B 19950213

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131126

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-12-18 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20131126

2013-11-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59305669

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MESSER GRIESHEIM G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051130

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2005-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051127

2005-11-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051127

2005-02-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-11-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-03-30 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-02-14 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2001-01-10 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU

2000-09-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HOOGOVENS STAAL BV * 19971204 LINDE AKTIENGESELLSC

- Effective date: 19971203

2000-08-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HOOGOVENS STAAL BV * 19971204 LINDE AKTIENGESELLSC

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HOOGOVENS STAAL BV

- Effective date: 19971203

1998-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 19971204

1997-11-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19971130

1997-05-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-05-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970411

1997-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59305669 19970410

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU

1997-03-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 149575 T 19970315

1996-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960411

1995-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950711

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU