Global Patent Index - EP 0673448 B1

EP 0673448 B1 2000-03-29 - Discrete fitting for a sliver feed tube

Title (en)

Discrete fitting for a sliver feed tube

Title (de)

Zubehörteil für ein Rohr zum Zuführen eines Faserbandes

Title (fr)

Tube-garniture monté sur un ruban de fibres

Publication

EP 0673448 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94929946 A

Priority

  • US 9411056 W
  • US 13446193 A
  • US 24241194 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9510647A1] A plant structure having three floors (3, 5, 7) with first and second ring spinning apparatuses (11, 13) located on the first floor and with vertical sliver feed tubes (31, 33) extending from the first and second ring spinning apparatuses respectively to the second floor for feeding a sliver (17, 23) through the sliver feed tube to the first ring spinning apparatus and to the third floor for feeding sliver from a can thereof to said second ring spinning apparatus. Each of the sliver feed tubes is provided with a fitting (41, 43), including a slide section (46) extending at an obtuse angle to the tubes, such that sliver strands descend through the tubes and through the associated fittings before they are fed into associated ring spinning machines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9510647 A1 19950420; DE 69423736 D1 20000504; DE 69423736 T2 20001116; EP 0673448 A1 19950927; EP 0673448 A4 19960410; EP 0673448 B1 20000329

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-10-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011015

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423736

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970904

1996-04-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19960222

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

1995-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950619

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE