Global Patent Index - EP 0673612 B1

EP 0673612 B1 2000-09-20 - Nail varnish brush and applicator assembly

Title (en)

Nail varnish brush and applicator assembly

Title (de)

Nagellackpinsel und Auflageeinheit

Title (fr)

Pinceau de vernis à ongles et ensemble d'application

Publication

EP 0673612 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400473 A

Priority

FR 9402945 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0673612A1] Brush for applying a make-up prod. comprises a tuft (2) of essentially parallel bristles (3) made of an elastomeric thermoplastic or vulcanisable material attached at one end to the free end of a handle (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 3/16; A46D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 3/16 (2006.01); A46D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 1/023 (2013.01); A46B 3/16 (2013.01); A46D 1/00 (2013.01); A46D 1/0238 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Dr. Otto Albrecht Neumüller: "Römpps Chemie-Lexicon, pages 3276-3277", 1987, Franckhische Verlagshandlung, Stuttgart

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0673612 A1 19950927; EP 0673612 B1 20000920; DE 69518867 D1 20001026; DE 69518867 T2 20010201; ES 2152369 T3 20010201; FR 2717057 A1 19950915; FR 2717057 B1 19960412; US 6176631 B1 20010123; US 6210060 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140304

2015-04-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150428

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140303

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69518867

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69518867

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152369 T3

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518867 20001026

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUERET, JEAN-LOUIS

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951031

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT