Global Patent Index - EP 0673617 B2

EP 0673617 B2 2000-08-16 - Bathtub support

Title (en)

Bathtub support

Title (de)

Wannenträger

Title (fr)

Support de baignoire

Publication

EP 0673617 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 95104090 A

Priority

DE 9404786 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0673617A1] The support is made of plastics or hard foam such as polystyrene or polyurethane foam and has along the long sides (7,7') near the base recesses (8,8') closable by shaped parts (11) which fit snug into the support. The shaped part at the back can be removed to allow the pipes to be fitted in the recess. An inspection opening for a siphon can be formed in the support base. The support base can have ideal break points arranged so that at least a part of the base can be removed to form a further inspection opening. The removable part should have the same dimensions as the existing inspection opening so that it can be used to close up the unrequired opening depending on the design.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/1605 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9404786 U1 19950420; EP 0673617 A1 19950927; EP 0673617 B1 19971217; EP 0673617 B2 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KONIGS WILFRIED

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-06-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020528

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-11-24 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2000-10-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2000-10-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2000-08-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

1999-01-04 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CORRECTA GMBH

1998-11-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORRECTA GMBH

- Effective date: 19980917

1998-03-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59501114 19980129

1997-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

1997-05-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL

1997-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970206

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951026

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR NL