Global Patent Index - EP 0673633 B1

EP 0673633 B1 2000-06-21 - Chair for medical or dental care

Title (en)

Chair for medical or dental care

Title (de)

Ärztlicher oder zahnärztlicher Behandlungsstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil de traitement médical ou dentaire

Publication

EP 0673633 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95104340 A

Priority

DE 4410277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0673633A2] The housing (43) is movably mounted on the back of the headrest (34), with a control (41) on the housing pivot mounted on a transverse axle (73). The control, in one piece with the housing, has a grip handle (72) or strip or recess (71) extending esp. across the vertical lengthwise centre plane of the chair. The bottom or back end of the housing has an opening, esp. slot (43e) for a headrest support, pref. a steering linkage (3b). The control or housing is held on a pref. plate-type holder (34c) extending pref. parallel to the headrest. The holder is pre-tensioned by a spring (40) force against a thrust piece (34a) towards the headrest.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 15/00; A61G 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/00 (2006.01); A61G 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 15/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0673633 A2 19950927; EP 0673633 A3 19951129; EP 0673633 B1 20000621; DE 4410277 A1 19951005; DE 4410277 C2 19970911; DE 4447716 C2 20000928; JP 2835012 B2 19981214; JP H07289596 A 19951107

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020529

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508478 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981204

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960403

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE