Global Patent Index - EP 0674021 B1

EP 0674021 B1 2000-12-06 - Process for inhibiting metal corrosion in aquous systems

Title (en)

Process for inhibiting metal corrosion in aquous systems

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verhinderung der Korrosion von Metallen in wässrigen Systemen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour inhiber la corrosion des métaux dans des systèmes aqueux

Publication

EP 0674021 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95103622 A

Priority

DE 4409990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0674021A1] Methylene blue (I) is used to inhibit corrosion of metals in aq. systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 11/16; C23F 11/08; C23F 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/08 (2006.01); C23F 11/10 (2006.01); C23F 11/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23F 11/08 (2013.01); C23F 11/10 (2013.01); C23F 11/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0674021 A1 19950927; EP 0674021 B1 20001206; AT 197970 T 20001215; DE 4409990 A1 19950928

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040314

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHILLING CHEMIE G.M.B.H. U. PRODUKTION K.G.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2004-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040314

2003-11-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ONDEO NALCO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2003-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ONDEO NALCO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Free text: SCHILLING CHEMIE GMBH U. PRODUKTION KG#STEINBEISSTRASSE 20-22#D-71691 FREIBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ONDEO NALCO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#STEINBEISSTRASSE 20-22#71691 FREIBERG (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508882 20010111

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197970 T 20001215

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971028

1996-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960327

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL