Global Patent Index - EP 0674326 B1

EP 0674326 B1 2000-05-10 - Electrical conductor having an insulation of plastic material

Title (en)

Electrical conductor having an insulation of plastic material

Title (de)

Elektrischer Leiter mit einer Isolierung aus Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Conducteur électrique comportant une isolation en matière plastique

Publication

EP 0674326 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95102470 A

Priority

DE 4410341 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0674326A2] An electrical conductor comprising an insulation of plastic material, characterized by an integral body made of a mixture of said plastic material and a content of metallic fibers, said fibers having a small cross-sectional dimension relative to the length, said body being molded by injection molding or extrusion, respectively, such that during said molding process said metallic fibers substantially concentrate in the central portion in view of the flowing direction of the molding process whereby a well-conductive conductor portion is formed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00; H01B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 1/22 (2006.01); H01B 5/16 (2006.01); H01B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0009 (2013.01); H01B 1/22 (2013.01); H01B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0674326 A2 19950927; EP 0674326 A3 19961023; EP 0674326 B1 20000510; DE 4410341 A1 19950928

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090222

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090222

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090222

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516746 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

1998-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980407

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970421

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT