Global patent index - EP 0674442 B1

EP 0674442 B1 2001-02-14 - Serial data processing using a pipeline

Title (en)

Serial data processing using a pipeline

Title (de)

Verarbeitung serieller Daten mittels einer Pipeline

Title (fr)

Traitement de données en série par pipeline

Publication

EP 0674442 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95301299 A

Priority

GB 9405914 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0674442A2] A multi-standard video decompression apparatus has a plurality of stages interconnected by a two-wire interface arranged as a pipeline processing machine. Control tokens and DATA Tokens pass over the single two-wire interface for carrying both control and data in token format. A token decode circuit is positioned in certain of the stages for recognizing certain of the tokens as control tokens pertinent to that stage and for passing unrecognized control tokens along the pipeline. Reconfiguration processing circuits are positioned in selected stages and are responsive to a recognized control token for reconfiguring such stage to handle an identified DATA Token.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/24; G06F 9/38; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/02 (2006.01); G06F 12/04 (2006.01); G06F 12/06 (2006.01); G06F 13/16 (2006.01); G06F 13/28 (2006.01); G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/28 (2013.01); G06F 12/0207 (2013.01); G06F 12/04 (2013.01); G06F 12/0607 (2013.01); G06F 13/1673 (2013.01); G06F 13/1689 (2013.01); H04N 19/423 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 19/13 (2014.11); H04N 19/91 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0674442 A2 19950927; EP 0674442 A3 19960814; EP 0674442 B1 20010214; AT 199200 T 20010215; AT 201123 T 20010515; AT 201124 T 20010515; AT 201125 T 20010515; AT 203868 T 20010815; CA 2145218 A1 19950925; CA 2145218 C 19991005; DE 69520076 D1 20010322; DE 69520076 T2 20010621; DE 69520852 D1 20010613; DE 69520852 T2 20011018; DE 69520893 D1 20010613; DE 69520893 T2 20010913; DE 69520894 D1 20010613; DE 69520894 T2 20010913; DE 69521927 D1 20010906; DE 69521927 T2 20020103; EP 0674443 A2 19950927; EP 0674443 A3 19981223; EP 0674443 B1 20010509; EP 0674446 A2 19950927; EP 0674446 A3 19960814; EP 0674446 B1 20010801; EP 0884910 A1 19981216; EP 0884910 B1 20010509; EP 0891088 A1 19990113; EP 0891088 B1 20010509; EP 0891089 A1 19990113; EP 0896473 A2 19990210; EP 0896473 A3 19990915; EP 0896474 A2 19990210; EP 0896474 A3 19990915; EP 0896475 A2 19990210; EP 0896475 A3 19990922; EP 0896476 A2 19990210; EP 0896476 A3 19990922; EP 0896477 A2 19990210; EP 0896477 A3 19990922; EP 0897244 A1 19990217; EP 0901286 A1 19990310; EP 0901287 A2 19990310; EP 0901287 A3 19990922; GB 2287850 A 19950927; GB 2287850 B 19981028; GB 9405914 D0 19940511; GB 9416153 D0 19940928; GB 9505942 D0 19950510; US 5625571 A 19970429; US 5689313 A 19971118

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150309

2015-04-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150309

2015-03-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69520076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-07-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-05-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100408 AND 20100414

2005-10-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1009627

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-11-21 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2003-04-18 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-22

2001-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-03-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL

2001-02-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199200

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990713

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990713

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970212

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL