Global patent index - EP 0674848 B1

EP 0674848 B1 2000-07-19 - Cigarette

Title (en)

Cigarette

Title (de)

Zigarette

Title (fr)

Cigarette

Publication

EP 0674848 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94303648 A

Priority

JP 5771094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0674848A1] A cigarette is manufactured by executing a cigarette manufacturing process. In a cut tobacco supply process of the manufacturing process, tobacco shreds (KT) are attracted by suction onto a first tobacco band (16) to form a cut tobacco layer (TLH). The cut tobacco layer delivered from the first tobacco band is folded into layer portions (LP) within a limited space, thereby forming a cut tobacco train (LR). During formation of the cut tobacco train, the tobacco shreds (KT) are arranged so that their leaf surfaces cross at right angles to the direction of delivery of the cut tobacco layer. Then, the cut tobacco train is attracted by suction onto a second tobacco band (26), and is delivered at a speed later than a speed of delivery of the cut tobacco layer. The cut tobacco layer is permitted to be folded in the cut tobacco train because there is a difference in a delivery speed between the cut tobacco layer and the cut tobacco train. Further, the cut tobacco train is wrapped in a paper web (2) to form a cigarette rod, and the formed cigarette rod is cut into individual cigarettes with a predetermined length. In the cigarette, the tobacco shreds (KT) are arranged so that their leaf surfaces cross at right angles to the axis of the cigarette. Therefore, the cigarette becomes harder, so that ability to maintain the appearance of the cigarette can be improved. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/18; A24D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2006.01); A24D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/18 (2013.01); A24C 5/1807 (2013.01); A24D 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0674848 A1 19951004; EP 0674848 B1 20000719; CA 2123974 A1 19950929; CA 2123974 C 19971230; CN 1042094 C 19990217; CN 1118668 A 19960320

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2005-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050510

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR

1999-10-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

1999-09-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): FR

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981120

1995-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19940609

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR