Global Patent Index - EP 0675192 B1

EP 0675192 B1 2002-09-11 - Use of organic bismuth compounds in extreme pressure grease lubricant compositions for rolling bearing application with extended service life

Title (en)

Use of organic bismuth compounds in extreme pressure grease lubricant compositions for rolling bearing application with extended service life

Title (de)

Verwendung von organischen Bismuthverbindungen in Hochdruckschmierfettzusammensetzungen für Wälzlager mit erhöhter Lebensdauer

Title (fr)

Utilisation de composés organiques à base de bismuth dans des compositions de graisse lubrifiante résistants aux pressions extrêmes pour des paliers à roulement présentant ainsi une longévité plus élevée

Publication

EP 0675192 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95200782 A

Priority

NL 9400493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0675192A1] The invention relates to the use of bismuth-compounds in an extreme pressure grease lubricant composition for rolling bearing applications for extending the useful service life of rolling bearings. The bismuth can be used as an additive, preferably an EP additive, or as a soap or thickener. The invention further relates to a method for preparing an extreme pressure lubricant composition in which a bismuth containing soap or thickener is mixed with an oil and optionally one or more EP- or other additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 117/02; C10M 117/04; C10M 129/32; C10M 129/40; C10M 129/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 117/02 (2006.01); C10M 117/04 (2006.01); C10M 129/26 (2006.01); C10M 129/40 (2006.01); C10M 129/44 (2006.01); C10M 169/06 (2006.01); F16C 33/66 (2006.01); C10N 10/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 30/08 (2006.01); C10N 30/10 (2006.01); C10N 30/12 (2006.01); C10N 40/02 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 129/40 (2013.01); C10M 117/02 (2013.01); C10M 117/04 (2013.01); C10M 119/22 (2013.01); C10M 119/24 (2013.01); C10M 119/30 (2013.01); C10M 129/32 (2013.01); C10M 129/44 (2013.01); C10M 129/50 (2013.01); C10M 129/58 (2013.01); C10M 169/06 (2013.01); C10M 2207/121 (2013.01); C10M 2207/122 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/128 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/141 (2013.01); C10M 2207/16 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2213/02 (2013.01); C10M 2213/062 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0675192 A1 19951004; EP 0675192 B1 20020911; DE 69528100 D1 20021017; DE 69528100 T2 20030102; JP 3727683 B2 20051214; JP H0841478 A 19960213; NL 9400493 A 19951101

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-04-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150327

2015-03-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69528100

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528100 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF ORGANIC BISMUTH COMPOUNDS IN EXTREME PRESSURE GREASE LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS FOR ROLLING BEARING APPLICATION WITH EXTENDED SERVICE LIFE

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKF ENGINEERING & RESEARCH CENTRE B.V.

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SKF ENGINEERING AND RESEARCH CENTRE B.V.

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971029

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950907

1995-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB